This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 18:20:32 (UTC).

Duane Jerry - v. - Daisy Baldwin

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 Duane Jerry filed an Other lawsuit against Daisy Baldwin. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duane Jerry

Defendant

Daisy Baldwin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICATESI, ANTHONY J

Attorney at THE LICATESI LAW GROUP, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

WEISS, ERIC MICHAEL

Attorney at Sette & Apoznanski

FLORES, JOHN CAVIN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SETTE AND APOZNANSKI

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Order with Notice of Entry

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

Seq. Nos. 001 and 002

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

Reply Affirmation

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Service

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Weiss, E. - filed by Sette & Apozanski; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Weiss, E. - filed by Sette & Apozanski; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Seq. Nos. 001 and 002; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Weiss, E. - filed by Sette and Apoznanski; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Weiss, E. - filed by Sette and Apoznanski; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Weiss, E. - filed by Sette and Apoznanski; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Flores, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Flores, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Licatesi, A.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less