This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:56:14 (UTC).

DRA IMAGING, PC - v. - JEANINE PASTORINO

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 DRA IMAGING, PC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEANINE PASTORINO. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1474

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRA IMAGING, PC

Defendant

Jeanine Pastorino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS, PAUL L

Attorney at PAUL L. MARKS

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction of Judgment

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/16/2018

JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk

JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit-non miltary

AFFIDAVIT affidavit-non miltary; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Mailing of a copy of the summons and complaint

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Mailing of a copy of the summons and complaint; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment-Default

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment-Default; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Summons and Complaint

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit-non miltary; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Mailing of a copy of the summons and complaint; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment-Default; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less