This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:15:03 (UTC).

DORIS ALICEA et al v. KRISTINA M VELEZ et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 DORIS ALICEA filed an Other lawsuit against KRISTINA M VELEZ. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ralph Porzio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ralph Porzio

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joshua Alicea

Doris Alicea

Defendants

Ana S Regus

Alfredo Rodriguez

Kristina M Velez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

Defendant Attorneys

SAHNI, RASLEEN K

Attorney at LAW OFFICE KAY & GRAY

BENJAMIN, DIMITRY

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

LESPERANCE, NICOLE EMLEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE

WISSEMANN, HILARY MADELINE

Attorney at KELLY, RODE & KELLY, LLP

ZEPPIERI, LORIS

Attorney at KELLY RODE KELLY

KOUBEK, ROBERT ANDREW

Attorney at KELLY RODE & KELLY, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Verified Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to Combined Demands 5/28/19

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to Combined Demands 5/28/19; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) statement of authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) statement of authorization; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Estrada-Collura, C.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Benjamin, D. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wissemann, H. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Demand for BP

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Demand for BP; Filed By: Wissemann, H. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Response to Combined Demands 5/28/19; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) statement of authorization; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Estrada-Collura, C.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) GFL; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Estrada-Collura, C.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Benjamin, D. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wissemann, H. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Demand for BP; Filed By: Wissemann, H. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less