This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:48:31 (UTC).

Doretta Blake - v. - 178 Wyona Owner LLC

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 Doretta Blake filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 178 Wyona Owner LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doretta Blake

Defendant

178 Wyona Owner LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHRMAN, MICHAEL ANDREW

Attorney at Lehrman & Maseng, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

ROSENGARTEN, SOLOMON

Attorney at SOLOMON ROSENGARTEN ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Rosengarten, S.; Filed: 07/25/2018; Received: 07/25/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G Summons

EXHIBIT(S) - G Summons; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F Process Server Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - F Process Server Affidavit; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E Notice of Entry with Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - E Notice of Entry with Judgment; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Entry with Default Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Entry with Default Judgment; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Department of State Records

EXHIBIT(S) - C Department of State Records; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lehrman, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 178 WYONA OWNERS LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 178 WYONA OWNERS LLC; Filed By: Lehrman, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - B Deed; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Rosengarten, S.; Filed: 07/25/2018; Received: 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Summons; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Process Server Affidavit; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Notice of Entry with Judgment; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Entry with Default Judgment; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Department of State Records; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lehrman, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 178 WYONA OWNERS LLC; Filed By: Lehrman, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Deed; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Deed; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Lehrman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less