Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 15:46:47 (UTC).

Donna Penczak - v. - Sung Yim M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 Donna Penczak filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Sung Yim M D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Penczak

Defendants

Sung Yim M.D.

Rockville Anesthesia Group, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penczak, Donna B

Defendant Attorneys

NAGLER, VINCENT A

Attorney at KOSTER, BRADY & NAGLER, LLP

MOBLEY, ERICA LYNN

Attorney at KOSTER BRADY & NAGLER LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - OTHER

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

--none--

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

--none--

DEMAND FOR:

--none--

DEMAND FOR:

--none--

BILL OF PARTICULARS

--none--

BILL OF PARTICULARS

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

--none--

CONSENT TO EFILING

--none--

COMPLAINT

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

SUMMONS

--none--

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Mobley, E.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Nagler, V.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Penczak, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less