This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 03/27/2020 at 15:31:06 (UTC).

DONNA MIRRO-BROWN - v. - THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 DONNA MIRRO-BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Mirro-brown

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Barbara A. Puccio

Vincent Marrapodi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EPSTEIN, MARK JAY

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

BRODERICK, ANN

LEWIS, JEFFREY WILLS

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broderick, A. - filed by New York City Law Dept; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Broderick, A. - filed by New York City Law Dept; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Broderick, A. - filed by New York City Law Dept; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry w/ Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry w/ Order; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer of The City of New York

EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer of The City of New York; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Answer w/ Cross-Claim Barbara A. Puccio and Vincent Marrapodi

EXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Answer w/ Cross-Claim Barbara A. Puccio and Vincent Marrapodi; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint, Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint, Answer; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Good Faith Affirmation

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Preclude

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Preclude; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims and Combined Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims and Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broderick, A. - filed by New York City Law Dept; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Broderick, A. - filed by New York City Law Dept; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Broderick, A. - filed by New York City Law Dept; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry w/ Order; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Answer of The City of New York; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Answer w/ Cross-Claim Barbara A. Puccio and Vincent Marrapodi; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Demand for Bill of Particulars & Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint, Answer; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Preclude; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims and Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS, JEFFREY WILLS