This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 11/18/2021 at 05:23:07 (UTC).

Donna Conte v. Nicole D. Chapple et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Donna Conte filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nicole D Chapple. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles C Merrell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0308

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Charles C Merrell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Conte

Defendants

Nicole D. Chapple

Melissa Conte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEARLMAN, EVA BRINDISI

Defendant Attorneys

SAVAGE, JOSEPH WILLIAM

MILLER, KEITH DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DVBOP ON TT

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DVBOP ON TT; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DVBOP ON CROSS-CLAIM

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DVBOP ON CROSS-CLAIM; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS

DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AS - Melissa Conte

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AS - Melissa Conte; Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 03/26/2021; Received: 03/26/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 05/24/2021; Received: 05/24/2021

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Savage, J.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Savage, J.; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 10/11/2021; Received: 10/11/2021

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2021; Received: 10/20/2021

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2021; Received: 10/20/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2021; Received: 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2021; Received: 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 10/11/2021; Received: 10/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Savage, J.; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Savage, J.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 05/24/2021; Received: 05/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AS - Melissa Conte; Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 03/26/2021; Received: 03/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DVBOP ON CROSS-CLAIM; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DVBOP ON TT; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM; Filed By: O'Hare, E.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Pearlman, E.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less