Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 12:00:26 (UTC).

Donald Miller - v. - OSIB-BCRE Bowery Street Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 Donald Miller filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OSIB-BCRE Bowery Street Holdings LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Arlene P Bluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Arlene P Bluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Miller

Defendants and Petitioners

OSIB-BCRE Bowery Street Holdings LLC

OSIB Bowery Street Operator LLC

The Rinaldi Group, LLC

Respondent

CONSTRUCTION STAFFING SOLUTIONS LLC

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEEGER, JUDD FRANKLIN

Attorney at Hecht, Kleeger & Damashek

Petitioner Attorney

NICHOLAS PETER CHRYSANTHEM (03269.00233 J90) LINDSAY FAITH KORN

Defendant Attorneys

CHRYSANTHEM, NICHOLAS PETER

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN

KORN, LINDSAY FAITH

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Respondent Attorney

ROBERT P. PAGANO (07500-33423)

Not Yet Classified Attorney

DAMASHEK, JONATHAN S

Attorney at HECHT, KLEEGER & DAMASHEK, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2020; Received: 05/19/2020

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation for 5/21/20 Conference

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation for 5/21/20 Conference; Filed By: Kleeger, J.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

NOTICE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

--none--

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

Third Party Summons, Impleader and Complaint with Exhibit A and B

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

Notice to take deposition of plaintiff

ANSWER

Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2020; Received: 05/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation for 5/21/20 Conference; Filed By: Kleeger, J.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Third-Party Summons and Complaint upon Plaintiff; Filed By: Chrysanthem, N.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected* Third Party Summons, Impleader and Complaint with Exhibit A and B; Filed By: Chrysanthem, N.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice to take deposition of plaintiff; Filed By: Chrysanthem, N.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Chrysanthem, N.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Damashek, J. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Damashek, J. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Damashek, J. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Damashek, J. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Damashek, J. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kleeger, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less