This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 16:43:43 (UTC).

Donald Hicks - v. - Niagara Lutheran Home & Rehabilitation Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 Donald Hicks filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Niagara Lutheran Home Rehabilitation Center, Inc. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Hicks as Administrator of the Estate of Willie Lee Hicks

Defendants

Niagara Lutheran Home & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.

Humboldt House Rehabilitation & Nursing Center

Niagara Lutheran Health System, Inc.

NHRC Aquisition, LLC

Niagara Lutheran Development, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUN, MICHELE ANN

Attorney at Brown Chiari LLP

Defendant Attorneys

PAPIA, STEPHEN CHARLES

Attorney at Bargnesi Britt PLLC

BRITT, JASON TYLER

Attorney at Bargnesi Britt PLLC

BARGNESI, JULIET MARIE

Attorney at Bargnesi Britt PLLC

DEMICHIEL, JESSICA MARIE

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan, LLP

PUGLISI, JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

SULLIVAN, KATHRYN MARIE

Attorney at KAUFMAN BORGEEST & RYAN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL

--none--

NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS re NOE

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Re. Order FILED 11.1.19

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEAL

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEAL

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

ANSWER

Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS- Niagara Lutheran Home & Rehab

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS- Niagara Lutheran Health System

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS- Niagara Lutheran Dev

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS- NHRC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS- Humboldt

COMPLAINT

--none--

SUMMONS

--none--

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL (Motion #002); Filed By: Puglisi, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Britt, J.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AOS re NOE; Filed By: Puglisi, J.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Re. Order FILED 11.1.19; Filed By: Puglisi, J.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #002); Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Information Relative to Interviews with Health Care Providers; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Maney, M.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Niagara Lutheran Home & Rehab; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Niagara Lutheran Health System; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Niagara Lutheran Dev; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- NHRC; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Humboldt; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Braun, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less