Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 14:56:19 (UTC).

Donald Dayton - v. - Alexander Rovner M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2017 Donald Dayton filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Alexander Rovner M D. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Dayton

Defendants

WNY Adult and Child Neurology, P.C.

Alexander Rovner M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ, RAFAEL OMAR

Attorney at Gomez & Becker, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

WIECZKOWSKI, JEFFREY A.

Attorney at The Tarantino Law Firm, LLP

GASIEWICZ, ERICA ROSE

Attorney at THE TARANTINO LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Correspondence Dated 1/5/2018

EXHIBIT(S)

Demand for VBOP and various discovery demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendants' Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Gasiewicz, E. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Correspondence Dated 1/5/2018; Filed By: Gasiewicz, E. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand for VBOP and various discovery demands; Filed By: Gasiewicz, E. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendants' Answer; Filed By: Gasiewicz, E. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Gasiewicz, E. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gasiewicz, E. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gasiewicz, E. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wieczkowski, J. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wieczkowski, J. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Wieczkowski, J. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Wieczkowski, J. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Gomez, R.; Filed: 06/11/2017; Received: 06/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gomez, R.; Filed: 06/11/2017; Received: 06/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less