This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 22:41:23 (UTC).

DJOUN ANDERSON - v. - LIBERTY READY MIX, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 DJOUN ANDERSON filed an Other lawsuit against LIBERTY READY MIX, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Djoun Anderson

Defendants

Darwin Williams-marcelino

LIBERTY READY MIX, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARNICK, THOMAS J

Attorney at HARNICK & HARNICK

HARNICK, THOMAS JONATHAN

Attorney at HARNICK & HARNICK

Defendant Attorney

CAMPANILE, MICHAEL V

Attorney at morris Duffy Alonso and Faley

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 02/07/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 02/07/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation In Reply and Further Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation In Reply and Further Support; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service and Legal Back

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 2 Color Photos of Vehicle operated by Plaintiff

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 2 Color Photos of Vehicle operated by Plaintiff; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 02/07/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation In Reply and Further Support; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 2 Color Photos of Vehicle operated by Plaintiff; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Services; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Harnick, T.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Campanile, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Harnick, T. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less