This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:03:05 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC - v. - VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

Defendants

John Doe

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Virginia Anne Lippa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fox, Christine L.

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

HEANEY, ALEXANDRA ROSE

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

WEINERT, DOUGLAS CHARLES

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC.

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

EISENBERG, ROSS

Attorney at Hasbani & Light P.C.

Defendant Attorney

SCHERMAN, RANDI MICHELLE

Attorney at QUEENS LEGAL SERVICES

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 10/19/2018; Received: 10/19/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) copy of the Notice of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) copy of the Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (NO TENANTS)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (NO TENANTS); Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 10/19/2018; Received: 10/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) copy of the Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Weinert, D.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (NO TENANTS); Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIRGINIA ANNE LIPPA; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less