This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:42:46 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC - v. - ROSALIND BREEDY et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROSALIND BREEDY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

Rosalind Breedy

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

JOHN DOES and JANE DOES, said names being fictitious, parties intended being possible tenants or occupants of premises and corporations, other entities or persons who have claim or may claim a lien against, or other interest in the premises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

WILLIAMS, HOPE LAUREN

Attorney at William Mattar, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 01/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ENVIRONMENTAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ENVIRONMENTAL; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) filed by SES 20181656

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) filed by SES 20181656; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/11/2018; Received: 10/11/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARKING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARKING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC TRANSIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC TRANSIT; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Labita, N.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) FILED BY CNW 20181656

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) FILED BY CNW 20181656; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by JQM - 20181656

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by JQM - 20181656; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Labita, N.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) filed by SES 20181656; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/11/2018; Received: 10/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) FILED BY CNW 20181656; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by JQM - 20181656; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS(DOE MAILING); Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Labita, N.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC TRANSIT; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Labita, N.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARKING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ENVIRONMENTAL; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sherer, J. - filed by ENTERPRISE PROCESS SERVICE; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less