Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/03/2020 at 14:30:12 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC - v. - MICHELE L. NEWTON et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MICHELE L NEWTON. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********91CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATAWIN VENTURES TRUST SERIES 2018-1

Defendants

Michele L Newton

Michael Newton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Filed by CAB - 20173772

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Filed by CAB - 20173772; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #1) Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #1) Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Filed by CZM - 20173772

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Filed by CZM - 20173772; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

OATH

OATH; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

OATH

OATH; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Filed by CAB - 20173772; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #1) Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Filed by CZM - 20173772; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less