This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 08:37:58 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC - v. - ANTONIO OCASIO et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANTONIO OCASIO. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Carmen Orozco

Wendy Velez

Antonio Ocasio

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF SIMMONS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC DBA IN NEW YORK AS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE, LLC

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

JOHN DOES and JANE DOES, said names being fictitious, parties intended being possible tenants or occupants of premises and corporations, other entities or persons who have claim or may claim a lien against, or other interest in the premises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

MARGARELLA, MICHAEL V.

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, DAVID RYAN

Attorney at Petroff Amshen LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION Affirmation to Cancel Lis Pendens

AFFIRMATION Affirmation to Cancel Lis Pendens; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE STIPULATION OF ADJOURNMENT

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE STIPULATION OF ADJOURNMENT; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) filed by zms 20181643

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) filed by zms 20181643; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC TRANSIT ADJUDICATION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC TRANSIT ADJUDICATION; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Bieler, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC PARKING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC PARKING; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Bieler, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC ENVIRONMENTAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC ENVIRONMENTAL; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Bieler, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLANDF FUNDING OF DELAWARE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLANDF FUNDING OF DELAWARE; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation to Cancel Lis Pendens; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE STIPULATION OF ADJOURNMENT; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) filed by zms 20181643; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to David R. Smith, Esq. regarding next conference for this matter for October 24, 2017 at 2:30 p.m.; Filed By: Margarella, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Bieler, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC TRANSIT ADJUDICATION; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Bieler, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC PARKING; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Bieler, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC ENVIRONMENTAL; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Bieler, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLANDF FUNDING OF DELAWARE; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Mitchell, U. - filed by Gaffney Ii, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less