This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 00:08:37 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK - v. - WAYNE P MCKENZIE

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAYNE P MCKENZIE. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Wayne P Mckenzie

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - WAYNE P MCKENZIE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - WAYNE P MCKENZIE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth Form; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Default

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Default; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Invoice for Service Costs

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Invoice for Service Costs; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Investigation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Investigation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Investigation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Invoice for Service Costs; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Default; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth Form; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - WAYNE P MCKENZIE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less