This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 20:45:43 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. VICKI L WITHERBEE

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICKI L WITHERBEE. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0314

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Vicki L Witherbee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VERHAGEN, JASON P

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

LOISELLE, ANNA L.

Attorney at Zwicker and Associates PC

SARKIS, ANDREANA MARIA

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates,

DEERY, ELIZABETH EMILY

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Investigation

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Investigation; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Invoice for Service Cost

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Invoice for Service Cost; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Default

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Default; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING auth

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING auth; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Vicki L Witherbee

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Vicki L Witherbee; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Investigation; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Invoice for Service Cost; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Default; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Hellenberg, J.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING auth; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Vicki L Witherbee; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less