This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/18/2021 at 04:56:24 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. TRISHA L WINCHELL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRISHA L WINCHELL. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0059

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Trisha L Winchell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARKE, ELIZABETH ANN

POWELL, LARRY T

VERHAGEN, JASON PETER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clarke, E. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Clarke, E. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - TRISHA L WINCHELL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - TRISHA L WINCHELL; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 04/22/2021; Received: 04/22/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 04/22/2021; Received: 04/22/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2021; Received: 06/04/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215G

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215G; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215G; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates P.C.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2021; Received: 06/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 04/22/2021; Received: 04/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - TRISHA L WINCHELL; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 04/22/2021; Received: 04/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Clarke, E. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clarke, E. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/05/2021; Received: 02/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less