This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 22:05:20 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -v.- STEPHEN L HUDSON

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 DISCOVER BANK -v - STEPHEN L HUDSON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Stephen L Hudson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 09/30/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 09/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 116001885928038

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 116001885928038; Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 09/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 116001885928038; Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less