This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 11/17/2021 at 06:09:40 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. STANLEY GARDNER

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STANLEY GARDNER. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0150

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Stanley Gardner

Binghamton, NY 13904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A client statement; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non-expiration of sol; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION aff in support; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION dod military search; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A client statement; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non-expiration of sol; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION aff in support; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION dod military search; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2021; Received: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/19/2021; Received: 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less