This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 21:36:46 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. ROBERT C NEWCOMB

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT C NEWCOMB. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********93CV

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Robert C Newcomb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

AFFIRMATION SEE NYSEF 7/25 NOTES-WRONG DOC FILED TO UPLOAD SIGNED PJTAFF

AFFIRMATION SEE NYSEF 7/25 NOTES-WRONG DOC FILED TO UPLOAD SIGNED PJTAFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

AFFIRMATION you removed signed pjtaff most likely it was wrong document therefore uploaded correct document

AFFIRMATION you removed signed pjtaff most likely it was wrong document therefore uploaded correct document; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SEE NYSEF 7/25 NOTES-WRONG DOC FILED TO UPLOAD SIGNED PJTAFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION you removed signed pjtaff most likely it was wrong document therefore uploaded correct document; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less