This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 21:40:32 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. RICHARD T JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RICHARD T JOHNSON. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0317

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Richard T Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UNDELIVERABLE MAIL/AFF OF SERVICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UNDELIVERABLE MAIL/AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UNDELIVERABLE MAIL/AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less