This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 14:44:25 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. MICHERYL BLAKE

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHERYL BLAKE. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0197

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Micheryl Blake

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

ALTMAN, ANNETTE T

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 05/11/2019; Received: 05/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 05/11/2019; Received: 05/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 117005955696219

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 117005955696219; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 05/11/2019; Received: 05/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 05/11/2019; Received: 05/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 117005955696219; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less