This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 04/21/2023 at 12:45:08 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. MICHAEL R GONG

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL R GONG. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Michael R Gong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/14/2021; Received: 04/14/2021

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

 

Docket Entries

08/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/14/2021; Received: 04/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less