Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 18:18:34 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. MARK H ELIZONDO

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARK H ELIZONDO. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Mark H Elizondo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOISELLE, ANNA L.

Attorney at Zwicker and Associates PC

VERHAGEN, JASON P

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

GRECO, LOUIS CARL

Attorney at Robert S. Gitmeid & Assoc., PLLC

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/10/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Mark H Elizondo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Mark H Elizondo; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Greco, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 12/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Mark H Elizondo; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Greco, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Loiselle, A. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less