This case was last updated from Wayne County Courts on 05/19/2020 at 12:59:19 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. LISA G CAUWELS

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LISA G CAUWELS. This case was filed in Wayne County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3455

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wayne, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Lisa G Cauwels

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTALBANO, GAETANO

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates P.C.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Montalbano, G. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Montalbano, G. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Montalbano, G. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION NOTICE OF LAWSUIT - LISA G CAUWELS

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION NOTICE OF LAWSUIT - LISA G CAUWELS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/22/2018; Received: 12/22/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/22/2018; Received: 12/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Lisa G Cauwels

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Lisa G Cauwels; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/22/2018; Received: 12/22/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Montalbano, G. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Montalbano, G. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Montalbano, G. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION NOTICE OF LAWSUIT - LISA G CAUWELS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/22/2018; Received: 12/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/22/2018; Received: 12/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Lisa G Cauwels; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/22/2018; Received: 12/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less