This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 02:37:29 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. FRANK C CANNARELLA

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANK C CANNARELLA. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0410

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Frank C Cannarella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

LEIDERMAN, JOEL D

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/05/2019; Received: 10/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/05/2019; Received: 10/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114002469659387

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114002469659387; Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/05/2019; Received: 10/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/05/2019; Received: 10/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114002469659387; Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less