This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:10:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. ELIZABETH J KERWIN

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELIZABETH J KERWIN. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ferris D. Lebous. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1101

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ferris D. Lebous

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Elizabeth J Kerwin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCULLY, JAMES PAUL

Attorney at KIRSCHENBAUM & PHILLIPS, P.C.

PHILLIPS, ELLIOT

Attorney at KIRSCHENBAUM & PHILLIPS, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Service Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Service Invoice; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

AFFIRMATION Aff of non-mil

AFFIRMATION Aff of non-mil; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT Aff of nonexp of statue

AFFIDAVIT Aff of nonexp of statue; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Exhibit List

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Exhibit List; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Service Invoice; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Aff of non-mil; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Aff of nonexp of statue; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Exhibit List; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less