Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 15:17:45 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. DONNA M KATZ

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DONNA M KATZ. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Donna M Katz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114002081643025

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114002081643025; Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114002081643025; Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less