Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 06:32:47 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. DAWN E MCKELVEY

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAWN E MCKELVEY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Dawn E Mckelvey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SARKIS, ANDREANA MARIA

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates,

VERHAGEN, JASON P

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Dawn E Mckelvey

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Dawn E Mckelvey; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Dawn E Mckelvey; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less