This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 15:22:10 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. CORRINE F SCARLOTTA

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CORRINE F SCARLOTTA. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0340

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Corrine F Scarlotta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCULLY, JAMES PAUL

Attorney at KIRSCHENBAUM & PHILLIPS, P.C.

PHILLIPS, ELLIOT

Attorney at KIRSCHENBAUM & PHILLIPS, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

VanZyverden, William

Attorney at Hemming & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Phillips, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less