Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 22:03:24 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. BURTON F DEIS

Case Summary

On 01/12/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BURTON F DEIS. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0066

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Burton F Deis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEERY, ELIZABETH EMILY

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

MCINTYRE, JOHN FRANCIS

Attorney at National Litigation Law Group, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Mcintyre, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-BURTON F. DEIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-BURTON F. DEIS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 01/12/2019; Received: 01/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 01/12/2019; Received: 01/12/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Deery, E. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Mcintyre, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-BURTON F. DEIS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 01/12/2019; Received: 01/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Assoc.; Filed: 01/12/2019; Received: 01/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less