This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 21:52:18 (UTC).

Discover Bank v. Brittany Wetsell

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brittany Wetsell. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7199

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Brittany Wetsell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT, JAMES T

SUSSMAN, DAVID JEFFREY

LUBIN, JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sussman, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Brittany Wetsell

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Brittany Wetsell; Filed By: Hunt, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Hunt, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL MAILING (COPY)

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL MAILING (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Facts by original creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Facts by original creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Affidavit of non expiration

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Affidavit of non expiration; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Invoice

PROOF OF SERVICE Invoice; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Invoice; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Affidavit of non expiration; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Facts by original creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment; Filed By: Lubin, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL MAILING (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Hunt, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Brittany Wetsell; Filed By: Hunt, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sussman, D.; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less