This case was last updated from Wayne County Courts on 05/19/2020 at 13:19:55 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. BRITTANY COLACINO

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRITTANY COLACINO. This case was filed in Wayne County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3436

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wayne, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Brittany Colacino

 

Court Documents

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE FOR SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE FOR SERVICE; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - BRITTANY COLACINO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - BRITTANY COLACINO; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE FOR SERVICE; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - BRITTANY COLACINO; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Rubino, K.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less