This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 13:09:15 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK v. ASHLEY BRAHM

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against ASHLEY BRAHM. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Ontario County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Ashley Brahm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

LEIDERMAN, JOEL D

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 03/09/2019; Received: 03/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 03/09/2019; Received: 03/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114008412053305

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114008412053305; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 03/09/2019; Received: 03/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 03/09/2019; Received: 03/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 114008412053305; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less