This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 23:06:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK - v. - ADOLFO PEREZ

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADOLFO PEREZ. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1042

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Adolfo Perez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POWELL, LARRY T

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215(G)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215(G); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE FOR SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE FOR SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth Form; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - ADOLFO PEREZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - ADOLFO PEREZ; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Powell, L. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215(G); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE FOR SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth Form; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - ADOLFO PEREZ; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less