This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:36:46 (UTC).

DISCOUNT COLUMBIA LLC - v. - STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 DISCOUNT COLUMBIA LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STARR INDEMNITY LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOUNT COLUMBIA LLC

Defendant

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TSAMBLAKOS, ISIDOROS I.

Attorney at MARKU, BENO & TSAMBLAKOS, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

MOROKNEK, MARK

Attorney at Kelly & Curtis, PLLC.

Curtis, Adam B.

Attorney at Kelly & Curtis

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of 2-1-18 Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of 2-1-18 Order; Filed By: Curtis, A.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

ORDER - OTHER dtd 2/1/18

ORDER - OTHER dtd 2/1/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 11-28-17 Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 11-28-17 Correspondence; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Confirmation notice for efiling Exhibit B

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Confirmation notice for efiling Exhibit B; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notce of Appearance and Demand for Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notce of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Simmons with Notice and Notice of E-filing availability

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Simmons with Notice and Notice of E-filing availability; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Curtis, A.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Tsamblakos, I.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of 2-1-18 Order; Filed By: Curtis, A.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 2/1/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 11-28-17 Correspondence; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Confirmation notice for efiling Exhibit B; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notce of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Simmons with Notice and Notice of E-filing availability; Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Moroknek, M.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Curtis, A.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Tsamblakos, I.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less