This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 00:21:36 (UTC).

Diana Mittman v. Rita Shats M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Diana Mittman filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Rita Shats M D. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Judith N. Mcmahon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Judith N. Mcmahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diana Mittman

Defendants

Island Nephrology Services, P.C.

Debra J. Werner M.D.

Michael L. Moretti M.D.

Farhang F. Ebrahimi M.D.

Richmond University Medical Center

Rita Shats M.D.

Island Obstetrics & Gynecology, P.C.

Amboy Medical Practice, P.C.

Pavlides & Benson OB/GYN Associates, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARLUCCI, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Attorney at COLLOPY & CARLUCCI, P.C.

AMEDURI, ANTHONY LOUIS

Attorney at AMEDURI GALANTE & FRISCIA

COLLOPY, ALICE FRANCES

Attorney at COLLOPY & CARLUCCI, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

O'DWYER, ALISON CHRISTINE

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER

RABINOWITZ, WAYNE I

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

MASTRO, WILLIAM FRANCIS

Attorney at VASLAS LEPOWSKY HAUSS & DANKE LLP

GINSBERG, JASON DAVID

Attorney at Vaslas Lepowsky Hauss & Danke LLP

HOLZKA, DENISE A.

Attorney at HEIDELL, PITTONI, MURPHY & BACH, LLP

RUBIN, ETHAN

Attorney at Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP

COSTANZA, DANIELLE MARIE

Attorney at HEIDELL, PITTONI, MURPHY & BACH LLP

FUSCO, KRISTEN

Attorney at Heidell Pittoni Murphy & Bach, LLP

MONTE, ANINA H

Attorney at Bower Law, P.C.

TYRRELL, THOMAS JOSEPH

Attorney at Bower Law P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Azs to Heidell Pittoni Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Azs to Heidell Pittoni Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Azs to Bower Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Azs to Bower Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Authorizations to Vaslas Lepowsky Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Authorizations to Vaslas Lepowsky Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Authorizations to Heidell Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Authorizations to Heidell Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Island Nephrology

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Island Nephrology; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Amboy Medical

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Amboy Medical; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Island OB/GYN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Island OB/GYN; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Pavlides

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Pavlides; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Ebrahimi

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Ebrahimi; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Moretti

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Moretti; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Werner

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Werner; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Shats

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Shats; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Azs to Heidell Pittoni Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Azs to Bower Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Authorizations to Vaslas Lepowsky Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Authorizations to Heidell Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands to Wilson, Elser Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on RUMC; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Island Nephrology; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Amboy Medical; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on Island OB/GYN; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Pavlides; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Ebrahimi; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Moretti; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Werner; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C on defendant Shats; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ameduri, A.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less