This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/15/2020 at 14:08:15 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FORMERLY KNOWN AS BANKERS TRUST COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE OF VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST 1999-2 - v. - STAFFORD MANNING et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FORMERLY KNOWN AS BANKERS TRUST COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, N A , AS TRUSTEE OF VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST 1999-2 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STAFFORD MANNING. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2721

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FORMERLY KNOWN AS BANKERS TRUST COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE OF VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST 1999-2

Defendants

Nadine A. Manning

Stafford Manning

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIERER, CYNTHIA ANNE

Attorney at The Margolin & Weinreb Law Group, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 09/07/2019; Received: 09/07/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) Decision and Order signed by the Hon. Hal B. Greenwald, J.S.C. on August 26, 2019.

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) Decision and Order signed by the Hon. Hal B. Greenwald, J.S.C. on August 26, 2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) DECISION AND ORDER

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) DECISION AND ORDER; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) DECISION AND ORDER

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) DECISION AND ORDER; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) INSTALLMENT CONTRACT

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) INSTALLMENT CONTRACT; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NADINE A. MANNING 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NADINE A. MANNING 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NADINE A. MANNING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NADINE A. MANNING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 09/07/2019; Received: 09/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) Decision and Order signed by the Hon. Hal B. Greenwald, J.S.C. on August 26, 2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) DECISION AND ORDER; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) DECISION AND ORDER; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) INSTALLMENT CONTRACT; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) FILED S&C AND LP; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NADINE A. MANNING 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NADINE A. MANNING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STAFFORD MANNING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less