This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 06:42:29 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE, IN TRUST, IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF SOUNDVIEW HOME LOAN TRUST 2007-WMC1, ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-WMC1 v. NAOMI MADISON AKA NYOMI MADISON AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF SONIA BRANIFF

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE, IN TRUST, IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF SOUNDVIEW HOME LOAN TRUST 2007-WMC1, ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-WMC1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NAOMI MADISON AKA NYOMI MADISON AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF SONIA BRANIFF. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE, IN TRUST, IN TRUST FOR REGISTERED HOLDERS OF SOUNDVIEW HOME LOAN TRUST 2007-WMC1, ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-WMC1

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA/INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

OLGA-MARIE PRATT AS HAIR TO THE ESTATE OF SONIA BRANIFF AKA SONIA N. BRANIFF

CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

NAOMI MADISON AKA NYOMI MADISON AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF SONIA BRANIFF AKA SONIA N. BRANIFF

BENEFICIAL HOMEOWNER SERVICE CORPORATION

CITY OF NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12

LYNNE BRANIFF AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF SONIA BRANIFF AKA SONIA N. BRANIFF

HOUSEHOLD FINANCE REALTY CORPORATION OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

May, Ted E

Attorney at Sheldon May & Associates PC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos naomi madison as heir

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos naomi madison as heir; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos john doe jd # 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos john doe jd # 1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos lynne braniff as heir

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos lynne braniff as heir; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos olga marie pratt as heir

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos olga marie pratt as heir; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM NAOMI MADISON AKA NYOMI MADISON AS HEIR TO THE EST OF SONIA BRANIFF AKA SONIA N. BRANIFF

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM NAOMI MADISON AKA NYOMI MADISON AS HEIR TO THE EST OF SONIA BRANIFF AKA SONIA N. BRANIFF; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CITY OF NY ENVIR CB 100 CHURCH ST NEW YORK NY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CITY OF NY ENVIR CB 100 CHURCH ST NEW YORK NY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS USA IRA 271 CADMAN PLAZA EAST BKLYN NY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS USA IRA 271 CADMAN PLAZA EAST BKLYN NY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CITY OF NY TRANSPORTATION PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CITY OF NY TRANSPORTATION PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BENEFICIAL HOMEOWERS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BENEFICIAL HOMEOWERS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JOHN DOE JD #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JOHN DOE JD #1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANTS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom united states of america

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom united states of america; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos nys

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos nys; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF NON MILITARY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF NON MILITARY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos naomi madison as heir; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos john doe jd # 1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos lynne braniff as heir; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos olga marie pratt as heir; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM NAOMI MADISON AKA NYOMI MADISON AS HEIR TO THE EST OF SONIA BRANIFF AKA SONIA N. BRANIFF; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CITY OF NY ENVIR CB 100 CHURCH ST NEW YORK NY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS USA IRA 271 CADMAN PLAZA EAST BKLYN NY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CITY OF NY TRANSPORTATION PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BENEFICIAL HOMEOWERS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS HOUSEHOLD FINANCE REALTY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JOHN DOE JD #1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JOHN DOE JD #1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANTS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom united states of america; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos nys; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF NON MILITARY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less