This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 16:52:52 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2003-HE2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2003-HE2 - v. - Jason S. Gough et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2018 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc Trust 2003-HE2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2003-HE2 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Jason S Gough. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank Caruso. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank Caruso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

Jason Gough

Jason S. Gough a/k/a Jason Gough

Jeff Palmer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #4)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #4); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #4) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #4) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #4) Adjournment Letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #4) Adjournment Letter; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A - Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A - Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE, CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE, CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #4)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #4); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND DISCONTINUE ACTION

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY notice of entry for judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY notice of entry for judgment; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #4); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #4) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #4) Adjournment Letter; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A - Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE, CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #4); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY notice of entry for judgment; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DI CARO, JOHN A