This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/15/2020 at 12:47:21 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED TRUST SERIES INABS 2005-B HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES INABS 2005-B - v. - STEPHANIE MAILLER et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED TRUST SERIES INABS 2005-B HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES INABS 2005-B filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STEPHANIE MAILLER. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2700

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED TRUST SERIES INABS 2005-B HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES INABS 2005-B

Defendants

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12, the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premi

Stephanie Mailler

Thomas C. Tucker

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC CONSUMER LENDING USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON STEPHANIE MAILLER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON STEPHANIE MAILLER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NON SERVE ON JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NON SERVE ON JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON THOMAS C. TUCKER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON THOMAS C. TUCKER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON THOMAS C. TUCKER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON THOMAS C. TUCKER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON STEPHANIE MAILLER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON STEPHANIE MAILLER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NON SERVE ON JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON THOMAS C. TUCKER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON THOMAS C. TUCKER; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less