This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 10/21/2022 at 13:35:31 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2005-OPT2, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates v. Jennifer C Butts et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2005-OPT2, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Jennifer C Butts. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerald A Keene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2580

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerald A Keene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2005-OPT2, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates

Defendants

Jennifer C Butts

Michael A Medinosky

Our Lady of Lourdes Memorial Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING SIGNED FILED 5.25.22

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING SIGNED FILED 5.25.22; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER OF REFERENCE SIGNED 12/10/2015 & FILED 8/16/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER OF REFERENCE SIGNED 12/10/2015 & FILED 8/16/2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER SIGNED FILED 8/16/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER SIGNED FILED 8/16/2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/07/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2014; Received: 10/20/2022

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2014; Received: 10/20/2022

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATION

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

CONSENT TO EFILING Letter Application to Convert Pending Action to E-Filing

CONSENT TO EFILING Letter Application to Convert Pending Action to E-Filing; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING SIGNED FILED 5.25.22; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER OF REFERENCE SIGNED 12/10/2015 & FILED 8/16/2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER SIGNED FILED 8/16/2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/07/2021; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2014; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2014; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2014; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING Letter Application to Convert Pending Action to E-Filing; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2013; Received: 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DI CARO, JOHN A