This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 13:04:55 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2005-NC5 Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates - v. - Shari Gilson

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2005-NC5 Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Shari Gilson. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE, FOR CARRINGTON MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2005-NC

Defendants

Shari Lynn Gilson

Shari Gilson a/k/a Shari Lynn Gilson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE *Corrected*

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Affidavit Under Section 255 of the NY Tax Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Affidavit Under Section 255 of the NY Tax Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Certificate of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Power of Attorney

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Referee's Oath and Report

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Referee's Oath and Report; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION (Motion #1)

FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order of Reference

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order of Reference; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 07/02/2017; Received: 07/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 07/02/2017; Received: 07/02/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Affidavit Under Section 255 of the NY Tax Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Referee's Oath and Report; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Granted Order of Reference; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Application for Order of Reference; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order of Reference; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 07/02/2017; Received: 07/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 07/02/2017; Received: 07/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less