This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 13:11:56 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR NEW CENTURY HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2005-4 - v. - ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR NEW CENTURY HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2005-4 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ARTHUR G HEYDENDAEL. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR NEW CENTURY HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2005-4

Defendants

Odette Heydendael-gernaert

Arthur G. Heydendael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIERER, CYNTHIA ANNE

Attorney at The Margolin & Weinreb Law Group, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NOE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE - Order of Reference

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE - Order of Reference; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) CPLR 3408 AFFIRMATION

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) CPLR 3408 AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) POWER OF ATTORNEY

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) POWER OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ODETTE HEYDENDAEL-GERNAERT 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ODETTE HEYDENDAEL-GERNAERT 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ODETTE HEYDENDAEL-GERNAERT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ODETTE HEYDENDAEL-GERNAERT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NOE; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOE - Order of Reference; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) CPLR 3408 AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) POWER OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ODETTE HEYDENDAEL-GERNAERT 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL 3215; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ODETTE HEYDENDAEL-GERNAERT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARTHUR G. HEYDENDAEL; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nierer, C. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less