This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 01:49:20 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee, for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-1 - v. - John Elder et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee, for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against John Elder. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee, for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-1

Defendants

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

Carol Elder a/k/a Carol L. Elder

CGF Anesthesiology Associates, PC

Niagara's Lazy Lakes Camping Resort Inc.

John Elder a/k/a John E. Elder, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A - Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A - Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A - Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less