Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/18/2020 at 22:21:01 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Certificate Trustee on Behalf of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2010-1 v. William E. Bald

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Certificate Trustee on Behalf of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2010-1 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against William E Bald. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank A Sedita. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank A Sedita

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Certificate Trustee on Behalf of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2010-1

Defendant

William E. Bald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FROST, DARIA MEGHAN

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski & Manfro, LLP

KOMOSINSKI, RICHARD F

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI, & MANFRO, LLP.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 WILLIAM E BALD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 WILLIAM E BALD; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WILLIAM E BALD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WILLIAM E BALD; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment of Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment of Judgment; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D September 23, 2009

EXHIBIT(S) - D September 23, 2009; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C July 21, 2009 Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C July 21, 2009 Order; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #001); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 WILLIAM E BALD; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WILLIAM E BALD; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment of Judgment; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D September 23, 2009; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C July 21, 2009 Order; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Note; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #001); Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Frost, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less