This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:29:39 (UTC).

DETECTIVES ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION et al - v. - THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 DETECTIVES ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert R Reed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert R Reed

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASSISTANT DEPUTY WARDENS/DEPUTY WARDENS ASSOCIATION

UNIFORMED SANITATION CHIEFS ASSOCIATION

CORRECTION CAPTAINS ASSOCIATION

CAPTAINS ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION

LIEUTENANT BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

UNIFORMED FIRE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION

SANITATION OFFICERS ASSOCIATION

DETECTIVES ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Robert W. Linn as commissioner of labor relations

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SALTZMAN, BARRY N.

Attorney at PITTA LLP

PALLADINO, MICHAEL AUGUSTIN

Attorney at Pitta LLP

BONOMO, JOSEPH MICHAEL

Attorney at Pitta LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GUSTAFSON, INGRID RUTH

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT

LEIGHTON, MAXWELL D

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Discontinuance (UFOA)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Discontinuance (UFOA); Filed By: Bonomo, J.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

AFFIRMATION Of Service of Notice of Entry

AFFIRMATION Of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Bonomo, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Of First Department Decision

NOTICE OF ENTRY Of First Department Decision; Filed By: Bonomo, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Partial Discontinuance

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Saltzman, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Collective Bargaining Agreement Between the City of New York and the Uniformed Sanitation Chiefs Ass ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Collective Bargaining Agreement Between the City of New York and the Uniformed Sanitation Chiefs Ass ... show more; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Uniform Superior Officers Coalition Economic Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Uniform Superior Officers Coalition Economic Agreement; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Maxwell D. Leighton

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Maxwell D. Leighton; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

STIPULATION - OTHER Extension of time to October 13, 2017, to respond to the Complaint

STIPULATION - OTHER Extension of time to October 13, 2017, to respond to the Complaint; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Palladino, M.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

STIPULATION - OTHER Extension of time to September 15, 2017, to respond to the Complaint

STIPULATION - OTHER Extension of time to September 15, 2017, to respond to the Complaint; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Saltzman, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Discontinuance (UFOA); Filed By: Bonomo, J.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Bonomo, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Of First Department Decision; Filed By: Bonomo, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Discontinuance; Filed By: Saltzman, B.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Saltzman, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Collective Bargaining Agreement Between the City of New York and the Uniformed Sanitation Chiefs Association; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Uniform Superior Officers Coalition Economic Agreement; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Maxwell D. Leighton; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Extension of time to October 13, 2017, to respond to the Complaint; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Palladino, M.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Extension of time to September 15, 2017, to respond to the Complaint; Filed By: Leighton, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Saltzman, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less