This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:02:33 (UTC).

DERICK DODOO v. 2427 WEBSTER REALTY, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 DERICK DODOO filed an Other lawsuit against 2427 WEBSTER REALTY, LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derick Dodoo

Defendant

2427 WEBSTER REALTY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRILL, JOHN P

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN P. GRILL

Defendant Attorneys

LEZAMIZ, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at AHMUTY, DEMERS & MCMANUS ESQS.

COLAMEO, THOMAS J

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 08/22/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 08/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

ANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Lezamiz, M.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIRMATION gfpc

AFFIRMATION gfpc; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST pcr

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST pcr; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lezamiz, M.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: 12/18/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: 12/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SNC

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SNC; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED AUGUST 22,2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED AUGUST 22,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos.2427webster

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos.2427webster; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: 12/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED AUGUST 22,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 08/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION gfpc; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST pcr; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lezamiz, M.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Lezamiz, M.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos.2427webster; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SNC; Filed By: Grill, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less