Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 00:26:38 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONALBANK v. LESA SCHOONMAKER

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONALBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LESA SCHOONMAKER. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONALBANK

Defendant

Lesa Schoonmaker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

Defendant Attorney

GRECO, LOUIS CARL

Attorney at Robert S. Gitmeid & Assoc., PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Greco, L.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Greco, L.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less